Williams v. Pelosi et al
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Defendant: People of the United States of America, Nancy Pelosi, People of the State of Illinois and Hilary Clinton
Case Number: 3:2020cv03208
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Supplement #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. (Document titled "Motion to Add Exhibits/Referring to Original Civil Complaint/Attachment") Responses due by 9/17/2020 (MAS, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Injunction Relief by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(SKN, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(SKN, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.3.3 as case 1:20-cv-05141, filed 09/01/2020. (ME, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (SKN, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), a court may, "in the interest of justice," "transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought." Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams, proceeding pro se, has filed this civil rights case in the Central District of Illinois. In reviewing the complaint (d/e #1 ), however, the Court notes that Plaintiff lists an address for herself which is in the Northern District of Illinois and that the conduct of which Plaintiff complains is alleged to have occurred within the Northern District of Illinois, meaning then that this case "might have been brought" in that district. The Court finds, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), that in the interest of justice, this matter should be transferred to the Eastern Division of the Northern District of Illinois. All pending motions are left for determination by that court. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 09/01/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
August 28, 2020 Remark: Motion for Leave to File Exhibits #4 , Motion for Leave to File Exhibits #5 and Motion for Leave to File Exhibit #6 termination date of 8/28/2020 removed. Motions remain pending. (SKN, ilcd). (Entered: 08/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Remark: Motion for Leave to File Exhibits #4 , Motion for Leave to File Exhibits #5 and Motion for Leave to File Exhibit #6 terminated and docket entries STRICKEN due to clerk inadvertently filing motions in the incorrect case. Motions to be filed in Plaintiff's case #20-3184. (SKN, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SKN, ilcd) Modified on 8/28/2020 to terminate motion and stricken docket entry due to clerk inadvertently filing in the incorrect case. Motion to be filed in Plaintiff's case #20-3184. (SKN, ilcd). Modified on 8/28/2020 to reopen motion. Clerk erroneously terminated motion.(SKN, ilcd).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SKN, ilcd) Modified on 8/28/2020 to terminate motion and stricken docket entry due to clerk inadvertently filing in the incorrect case. Motion to be filed in Plaintiff's case #20-3184. (SKN, ilcd) Modified on 8/28/2020 to reopen motion. Clerk erroneously terminated motion.(SKN, ilcd).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SKN, ilcd) Modified on 8/28/2020 to terminate motion and stricken docket entry due to clerk inadvertently filing in the incorrect case. Motion to be filed in Plaintiff's case #20-3184. (SKN, ilcd). Modified on 8/28/2020 to reopen motion. Clerk erroneously terminated motion. (SKN, ilcd).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SKN, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AEM, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee PD $ 400 rec #34626012202.), filed by Helene Tonique Williams. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Envelope)(AEM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pelosi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?