Anderson v. Hinckley
Plaintiff: Juli Anderson
Defendant: Jeremiah Hinckley
Case Number: 3:2020cv03209
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
2 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
3 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jeremiah Hinckley. (MAS, ilcd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/9/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bridget L Schott on behalf of Jeremiah Hinckley (Schott, Bridget)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/20/2020. Case reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce and Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long for all further proceedings. Judge Sue E. Myerscough, Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins no longer assigned to case. (KE, ilcd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremiah Hinckley ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3452565.), filed by Juli Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Bradley) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct typographical error. (KE, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Hinckley
Represented By: Bridget L Schott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juli Anderson
Represented By: Bradley B Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?