Emery v. Advanced Marketing & Processing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shayne Emery
Defendant: Advanced Marketing & Processing, Inc. and Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc doing business as Protect My Car
Case Number: 3:2020cv03226
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc. (Hudson, Timothy)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc.(Hudson, Timothy)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy A Hudson on behalf of Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc (Hudson, Timothy)
October 27, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Wednesday, 12/2/2020, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 11/30/2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Shayne Emery as to Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc 10/5/2020. (Levin, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc. Original resent to Attorney to effectuate service. (GL, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Shayne Emery as to Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc. (GL, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc. and returned to Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service. (ME, ilcd)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Brian Levin on behalf of Shayne Emery (Levin, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Marketing & Processing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3462634.), filed by Shayne Emery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement summons)(Levin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emery v. Advanced Marketing & Processing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayne Emery
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Marketing & Processing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Marketing & Processing Inc doing business as Protect My Car
Represented By: Timothy A Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?