Logan v. Entzel
Petitioner: Eddrick Mareicus Logan
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Case Number: 3:2020cv03318
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 USCA CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddrick Mareicus Logan. (RES, ilcd)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 1/19/2021. Petitioner has filed a Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis #9 . The Court may authorize Petitioner to proceed on appeal without prepayment of fees if the Court finds he is unable to pay such fees and the appeal is taken in good faith. See Fed. R. App. P. 24. Petitioners Motion indicates that he has received no income or gifts in the past year and has no assets. However, Petitioners Trust Fund Ledger shows that he currently has a balance of $1,169.99 in his account. Petitioner is incarcerated and all of his basic living expenses are paid by the Government. Accordingly, the Court finds that Petitioner does have the means to pay the $505 fee. Moreover, the Court finds that the appeal is not in good faith. An appeal is taken in good faith if "a reasonable person could suppose that the appeal has some merit." Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626, 632 (7th Cir. 2000) (en banc). Here, Petitioner challenges his designation as a career criminal under the advisory Sentencing Guidelines. As explained in the Courts Order #3 , this challenge is foreclosed pursuant to Seventh Circuit precedent. The Court finds that no reasonable person could suppose that the appeal has some merit. Accordingly, the Court certifies that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis #9 is DENIED. (RES, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Eddrick Mareicus Logan regarding #5 Notice of Appeal (RES, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Eddrick Mareicus Logan (RES, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner Eddrick Mareicus Logan. Responses due by 1/25/2021 (RES, ilcd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 3(b) NOTICE of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddrick Mareicus Logan. (RES, ilcd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA regarding #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddrick Mareicus Logan. USCA Case Number 20-3515. (RES, ilcd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals regarding #5 Notice of Appeal. (RES, ilcd)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order by Eddrick Mareicus Logan. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(RES, ilcd)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered. (RES, ilcd)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 12/14/2020. Petitioner Logan's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (d/e 1) is SUMMARILY DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255(e). This case is CLOSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare the Judgment. See Full Written Order.(RES, ilcd)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 12/14/2020 dismissing #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER, d/e #3 . (JRK, ilcd)
December 7, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626039184. (JS, ilcd)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 12/3/2020. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 but has not paid the $5 filing fee. Petitioner is DIRECTED to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before January 4, 2020, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (ANW, ilcd)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law by Eddrick Mareicus Logan. (ED, ilcd)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eddrick Mareicus Logan.(ED, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddrick Mareicus Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?