Boyd v. Spokeo Inc
Plaintiff: Anna Boyd
Defendant: Spokeo, Inc. and Spokeo Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv03020
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Joint Motion for a Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 is ALLOWED. Plaintiff is given until 4/12/2021 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) #9 , and Defendant is given leave to file a reply by 5/3/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 3/11/2021. (GL)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6) by Plaintiff Anna Boyd. Responses due by 3/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larry, James)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spokeo Inc re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6), #10 Notice (Other) (Corrected) (Gill, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Constitutional Question re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6) (Gill, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6) by Defendant Spokeo Inc. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gill, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Motions for Leave to Participate While Application for Admissions to Practice are Pending #7 #8 are ALLOWED. Attorneys John Nadolenco and Daniel Queen are allowed to enter their appearances pro hac vice. The Court notes that both Attorneys Nadolenco and Queen have applied for admission to practice in the Central District of Illinois and that those applications are pending completion. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5, Attorneys Nadolenco and Queen are directed to take steps to complete admission to practice in the Central District of Illinois and further after securing regular admission from the Central District of Illinois, must make application for registration in our electronic filing system. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 3/5/2021. (GL)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Participate While Application for Admission to Practice is Pending by John Nadolenco on behalf of Defendant Spokeo Inc. Responses due by 3/18/2021. (MJC)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Participate While Application for Admission to Practice is Pending by Daniel Queen on behalf of Defendant Spokeo Inc. Responses due by 3/18/2021. (MJC)
February 1, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant Spokeo, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #6 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 3/8/2021. (LB, ilcd)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant Spokeo Inc. Responses due by 2/12/2021 (Gill, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Spokeo Inc. (Gill, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael J Gill on behalf of Spokeo Inc (Gill, Michael)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Spokeo Inc. Original returned to Attorney James Dominick Larry to effectuate service. (GL, ilcd)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Anna Boyd. (Larry, James)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Spokeo, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3566805.), filed by Anna Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Larry, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Spokeo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Boyd
Represented By: James Dominick Larry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokeo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokeo Inc
Represented By: Daniel D Queen
Represented By: John Not applicable Nadolenco
Represented By: Michael J Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?