Williams v. The People of the State of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Defendant: Leroy K Martin, Jr, Carol M Howard and The People of the State of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2021cv03024
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Remark: Objection received 2/25/2021 will not be efiled as it is duplicitous of the Objection filed on 2/24/2021 at d/e #6 . (GL)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendations and MOTION to Withhold Consent without adverse substantive of any of further filed motions / consequences against them by the Magistrate Judge, and explanation. (ME)
February 17, 2021 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Removal to remove a criminal proceeding pending in the Cook County, Illinois, Circuit Court, Case No. 19-CR-6839. Amended Notice of Removal #2 . This Court recommends that the removal in this matter be stricken and the matter remanded. Notice of removal must be filed in the District and division within which the action is pending. 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Cook County Circuit Court is in the Northern District, Eastern Division. The removal to this District, therefore, is not proper. The matter should be remanded and this case should be closed. The parties are advised that any objection to this Report and Recommendation must be filed in writing with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen days after service of a copy of this Report and Recommendation. 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Failure to file a timely objection will constitute a waiver of objections on appeal. See Video Views, Inc. v. Studio 21, Ltd., 797 F.2d 538, 539 (7th Cir. 1986). See Local Rule 72.2. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 2/17/2021. (MAS, ilcd)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Records from Cook County Circuit Court by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cook County Records Part 1, #2 Cook County Records Part 2, #3 Cook County Records Part 3A, #4 Cook County Records Part 3B)(GL, ilcd)
February 9, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 14626039867 (AH, ilcd)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Reverse Warrant for Arrest / Motion to Report Denial of Due Process/ Pay $402.00 docket fee/ with exhibit by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 2/22/2021 (ME, ilcd)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION (Titled "Motion to File both a civil lawsuit / Amended Notice of Removal") by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 2/18/2021 (ME, ilcd)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Helene Tonique Williams.(ME, ilcd)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number 19CR6839, filed by Helene Tonique Williams.(ME, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The People of the State of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy K Martin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol M Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?