James v. Cutting Edge Realty, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juliett James
Defendant: Cutting Edge Realty, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv03028
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Joinder of Additional Defendant #13 is ALLOWED. Plaintiff may amend her Complaint #11 as a matter of course in the current posture of this case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Plaintiff seeks to add John Glidewell as a Defendant. Plaintiff, however, has not submitted a proposed Amended Complaint that alleges her claims against Glidewell. Plaintiff is directed to file by 4/5/2021 an Amended Complaint that includes Plaintiffs current allegations and claims and adds Plaintiff's allegations and claims against Glidewell. Upon the filing of the Amended Complaint, the Clerk is directed to issue the summons attached to the Motion and return it to Plaintiff for service. Entered on 3/15/2021. (ME)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION ("Joinder of Additional Defendant") by Plaintiff Juliett James. Responses due by 3/25/2021 (ME)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Cutting Edge Realty, Inc. Summons returned by mail to Plaintiff to effectuate service. (SKN, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07549. .
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (jn, )
January 18, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court reinstates this case for the sole purpose of transferring the case forthwith to the Central District of Illinois. Because the filing fee has now been paid, after the transfer, the Clerk of the Court for the Central District of Illinois shall issue summons. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Courtroom Deputy on 12/28/20.Mailed notice(ca, )
December 27, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee as required by Northern District of Illinois Local Rule 3.3(b), and she has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis or a financial affidavit pursuant to Northern District of Illinois Local Rule 3.3(c). Plaintiff, a citizen of California, is suing a defendant with its principal place of business in Decatur, Illinois in Macon County regarding a contract involving real estate located in Clinton, Illinois, in Dewitt County. Neither of those counties are within the Northern District of Illinois, and, thus, Plaintiff has filed this case in the improper venue. If Plaintiff decides to refile this case, she should file it in the Central District of Illinois, not here. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 COMPLAINT (re-entered due to transfer from NDIL) against Cutting Edge Realty, Inc., filed by Juliett James.(ME, ilcd)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Juliett James. (lw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (lw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and one copy by Juliett James. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Cutting Edge Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutting Edge Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliett James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?