MNG 2005, Inc. v. G2 Web Services, LLC
Plaintiff: MNG 2005, Inc.
Defendant: G2 Web Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03071
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MNG 2005, Inc.. G2 Web Services, LLC waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Cohen, Nathan)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to G2 Web Services, LLC and returned to Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service (SKN) Modified on 3/30/2021 to show issued summons returned to Plaintiff's counsel (SKN). (Summons without signature replaced with summons with signature on 4/1/2021) NEF regenerated to all parties (SKN).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet: Document efiled by Attorney as fillable adobe form. Document replaced with correct format of adobe document. (ME)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Refund of Overpayment (d/e #3 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refund Attorney Nathan S. Cohen in the amount of $402.00, which was an overpayment of filing fees. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 03/17/2021. (SKN)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION Refund of Overpayment by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. Responses due by 3/29/2021 (Cohen, Nathan)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM Signed Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G2 Web Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3611061.), filed by MNG 2005, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Cohen, Nathan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/24/2021) (ME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MNG 2005, Inc. v. G2 Web Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MNG 2005, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Scott Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G2 Web Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?