Hammond v. Health Care Service Corporation
Plaintiff: JULIA T HAMMOND
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation doing business as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois and Health Care Service Corporation A Mutual Legal Reserve Company doing business as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2021cv03090
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Julia T Hammond. (Rouse, Turner)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Health Care Service Corporation. Original returned to Attorney Turner A. Rouse to effectuate service. (GL)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Health Care Service Corporation dba Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois on 4/19/2021, filed by JULIA T HAMMOND. (Rouse, Turner)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Health Care Service Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3638516.), filed by JULIA T HAMMOND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rouse, Turner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA T HAMMOND
Represented By: Turner A Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation doing business as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation A Mutual Legal Reserve Company doing business as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?