Kuehner v. Austin
Petitioner: Danny Kuehner
Respondent: Glen Austin
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2021cv03105
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason F Krigel on behalf of Glen Austin (Krigel, Jason)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/3/2021. Petitioner's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is DENIED. Petitioner's Motion to Request Counsel #4 is DENIED. Respondent has 60 days to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Petition #1 . See written Order.(DS)
May 3, 2021 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 5/3/2021, in the amount of $ 5.00; receipt number 14626040539. (AH)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Danny Kuehner. Responses due by 5/13/2021. (DS)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Danny Kuehner. (DS)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Danny Kuehner. Responses due by 5/13/2021. (DS)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Danny Kuehner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuehner v. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Kuehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Glen Austin
Represented By: Jason F Krigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?