Willis v. Verticchio
Plaintiff: Daniel Willis
Defendant: Jono Verticchio
Case Number: 3:2021cv03110
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered. (KB)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/1/2021. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE because it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and because any attempt by Plaintiff to amend his complaint would be futile. 28 U.S.C. 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in Defendant's favor and against Plaintiff. This case is CLOSED. 3. If Plaintiff wishes to appeal this judgment, he must file a notice of appeal with this Court within thirty (30) days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). 4. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, his motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis must identify the issues that he will present on appeal to assist the Court in determining whether the appeal is taken in good faith. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1)(c); Celske v. Edwards, 164 F.3d 396, 398 (7th Cir. 1999)(an appellant should be given an opportunity to submit a statement of his grounds forappealing so that the district judge "can make a responsible assessment of the issue of good faith."); Walker v. OBrien, 216 F.3d 626, 632 (7th Cir. 2000)(providing that a good faith appeal is an appeal that "a reasonable person could suppose... has some merit" from a legal perspective). If Plaintiff chooses to appeal, he will be liable for the $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (KB)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Daniel Willis. (KE)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Daniel Willis. (KE)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/17/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $63.50. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 6/16/2021 (KE)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Daniel Willis. (KE)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Daniel Willis.(KE)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jono Verticchio, filed by Daniel Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Verticchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jono Verticchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?