AMCO Insurance Company v. Chronister Oil Company et al
Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company and Depositors Insurance Company
Defendant: April Mohn and Chronister Oil Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv03143
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Agreed Joint Motion to Stay Litigation for 60 Days #4 is ALLOWED. This case is STAYED until 9/20/2021. Plaintiffs are directed to file a written status report on or before 9/20/2021. (LB)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay AGREED by Plaintiffs AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloom, Matthew)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company. (Bloom, Matthew)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew Ryan Bloom on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company (Bloom, Matthew)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chronister Oil Company, April Mohn ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3700157.), filed by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Bloom, Matthew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/30/2021) (MAS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2021: #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMCO Insurance Company v. Chronister Oil Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Mohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chronister Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?