Schlensker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mark E. Schlensker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv03149
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Mark E. Schlensker as to Commissioner of Social Security; U S Attorney General served by certified mail on 8/6/2021. (MAS)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/27/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Attachment: #1 Complaint)(MAS)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 7/16/2021. (MAS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Meredith E Marcus on behalf of Mark E. Schlensker (Marcus, Meredith)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Mark E. Schlensker (Daley, Frederick)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark E. Schlensker. Responses due by 7/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms (combined))(Daley, Frederick)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mark E. Schlensker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlensker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Schlensker
Represented By: Meredith E Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?