Apalone Inc. v. Schutt Sports LLC et al
Plaintiff: Apalone, Inc. and Apalone Inc.
Defendant: Schutt Sports, LLC, Certor Sports, LLC, Schutt Sports LLC and Certor Sports LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03186
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,938,817 by Plaintiff Apalone Inc.. Responses due by 11/5/2021 (Niro, Raymond)
October 22, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/22/2021 with Attorneys Kyle Wallenberg, Raymond Niro Jr., Bailey Benedict, Matthew Trapp, and Thad Kodish. Written Scheduling Order to follow. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. (LB)
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,938,817 by Defendants Certor Sports LLC, Schutt Sports LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bailey Benedict, #2 Declaration of Vince Long, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11-A, #14 Exhibit 11-B, #15 Exhibit 11-C, #16 Exhibit 11-D, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18-A, #24 Exhibit 18-B, #25 Exhibit 18-C, #26 Exhibit 18-D, #27 Exhibit 19-A, #28 Exhibit 19-B, #29 Exhibit 19-C, #30 Exhibit 20)(Kodish, Thad)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Apalone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan)(Wallenberg, Kyle)
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Apalone Inc..(Niro, Raymond)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Wonjoon Chung on behalf of Certor Sports LLC, Schutt Sports LLC (Chung, Wonjoon)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bailey Benedict on behalf of Certor Sports LLC, Schutt Sports LLC (Benedict, Bailey)
September 24, 2021 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Friday, 10/22/2021, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 10/20/2021. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew Robert Trapp on behalf of All Defendants (Trapp, Matthew)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David A Herman on behalf of All Defendants (Herman, David)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Defendants Schutt Sports, LLC and Certor Sports, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 (Kodish, Thad)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Certor Sports LLC, Schutt Sports LLC. (Kodish, Thad)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES , COUNTERCLAIM against Apalone Inc. by Certor Sports LLC, Schutt Sports LLC.(Kodish, Thad)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apalone Inc.. All Defendants. (Niro, Raymond)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Certor Sports LLC, Schutt Sports LLC. Originals returned to Attorney Raymond P. Niro, Jr. to effectuate service. (GL)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kyle David Wallenberg on behalf of Apalone, Inc. (Wallenberg, Kyle)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Raymond P Niro, Jr on behalf of Apalone, Inc. (Niro, Raymond)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent by Apalone, Inc.. (Niro, Raymond)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Apalone, Inc.. (Niro, Raymond)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certor Sports, LLC, Schutt Sports, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3743527.), filed by Apalone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,938,817, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 10,617,167, #3 Exhibit Decision in IPR2020-00501, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Summons for Certor Sports, LLC, #6 Supplement Summons for Schutt Sports, LLC)(Niro, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apalone Inc. v. Schutt Sports LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apalone, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Wallenberg
Represented By: Raymond P Niro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apalone Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Wallenberg
Represented By: Raymond P Niro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schutt Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certor Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schutt Sports LLC
Represented By: Bailey Benedict
Represented By: David A Herman
Represented By: Matthew Robert Trapp
Represented By: Wonjoon Chung
Represented By: Thad C. Kodish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certor Sports LLC
Represented By: Matthew Robert Trapp
Represented By: Wonjoon Chung
Represented By: Thad C. Kodish
Represented By: Bailey Benedict
Represented By: David A Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?