Reyes v. The Maschhoffs, LLC
Plaintiff: Rene Reyes
Defendant: The Maschhoffs, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03202
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Defendant The Maschhoffs, LLC. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (Caisman, Lauren)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William H Beaumont on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Beaumont, William)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Herbert R Giorgio, Jr on behalf of The Maschhoffs, LLC (Giorgio, Herbert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) by Defendant The Maschhoffs, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Caisman, Lauren)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by The Maschhoffs, LLC. (Caisman, Lauren)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lauren Jennifer Caisman on behalf of The Maschhoffs, LLC (Caisman, Lauren)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #5 is ALLOWED. Defendant is given until 11/26/2021 to respond to the Class Action Complaint #1 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 10/8/2021. (GL)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Maschhoffs, LLC. Original returned to Attorney William Beaumont to effectuate service. (GL)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Maschhoffs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3762406.), filed by Rene Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beaumont, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. The Maschhoffs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Reyes
Represented By: William H Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Maschhoffs, LLC
Represented By: Herbert R Giorgio, Jr
Represented By: Lauren Jennifer Caisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?