Cobb v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Phillip D Cobb
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security - Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2024cv03195
Filed: July 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colleen R Lawless
Referring Judge: Karen L McNaught
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 9/4/2024 granting #11 Motion for Attorney Fees. See full written Order. (RES)
September 3, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Jean)
August 29, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Phillip D Cobb. Responses due by 9/12/2024 (Dempsey, Vicki)
August 23, 2024 Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered. (RES)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 8/23/2024. The Parties' Joint Stipulation to Remand to the Commissioner #8 is GRANTED. It is hereby Ordered that this matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, which is codified at 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g), and Judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff. See full written Order. (RES)
August 22, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Remand by Commissioner of Social Security.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Jean)
August 22, 2024 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT. Plaintiff Brief due by 9/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript, #11 Transcript, #12 Transcript, #13 Transcript, #14 Transcript)(Patel, Hinal)
August 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Certified Administrative Record in Lieu of Answer (Patel, Hinal)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Hinal A Patel on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Patel, Hinal)
July 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jean M Godfrey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Godfrey, Jean)
July 18, 2024 Filing 3 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Dempsey, Vicki)
July 18, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Phillip D Cobb. Responses due by 8/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Proceed IFP)(Dempsey, Vicki)
July 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Phillip D Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dempsey, Vicki)
July 18, 2024 NOTICE of Social Security Complaint filed. Commissioner of Social Security answer due on 9/16/2024. (RES)
July 18, 2024 TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 7/18/2024: Plaintiff Phillip Cobb's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates the plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee. The motion is ALLOWED. (RES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security - Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip D Cobb
Represented By: Vicki A Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jean M Godfrey
Represented By: Hinal A Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?