Eilenfeldt v. United CUSD 304 Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Eilenfeldt
Defendant: United CUSD 304 Board of Education, Jeff Whitsitt, Kristen Nelson, Ryan Westart, Lori Schrock, Donna Winbigler, Dennis Brown and Does I-XX
Case Number: 4:2012cv04029
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Rock Island Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: John A. Gorman
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 14, 2016. Defendants' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Qualified Immunity is GRANTED, as are their two 56 , 58 motions to supplement that motion. Count III of Plaintiff's 33 Second Amended Complaint is dismissed. (SC, ilcd)
September 4, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 the Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. See Written Order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/4/2015. (KZ, ilcd)
March 25, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 25, 2015. Defendants' 32 Motion for Direction from the Court is MOOT, the 36 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, the 37 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitation is GRANTED, and the 40 Motion to Supplement is DENIED. (SC, ilcd)
March 25, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 25, 2014. Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and Defendants' 30 Motion to Supplement Case Law is GRANTED. The Court GRANTS Eilenfeldt leave to amend her complaint consistent with this Order. (MRD, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eilenfeldt v. United CUSD 304 Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Eilenfeldt
Represented By: Jason J Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United CUSD 304 Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Whitsitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Westart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Winbigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?