United States of America v. Approximately 64 Dogs

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately 64 Dogs
Claimant: Sherrick Houston, Jaquan Jones, Terrill McDuffy and Willie Jackson
Case Number: 4:2016cv04074
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Rock Island Office
County: Rock Island
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Forfeiture of Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on June 26, 2017. The Court GRANTS the Government's 52 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court finds no just reason for delay, and directs entry of final judgment as to the two defaulted defendant dogs and the claimant Willie Jackson pursuant to Rule 54(b). Pursuant to 15U.S.C § 1177 and 7 U.S.C. § 2156(f), the U.S. Marshal Service may dispose of the two defendant dogs according to law, including, if appropriate, transferring all right, title, and interest in any of these two dogs to a shelter or other appropriate organization. (RS1, ilcd)
May 18, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on May 18, 2017. The Clerk is ordered to STRIKE the 10 12 claims filed by Willie Jackson and Jaquan Jones. The Court GRANTS the Government's 42 44 motions for default as they pertain to Jackson and Jones. The Government's 46 Motion to Dismiss One Seized Dog as Defendant is GRANTED. The dog identified as IL6A01 is dismissed as a defendant. (RS1, ilcd)
January 26, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on January 26, 2017. The Clerk is ordered to STRIKE the [9, 11, 13, 14, 15] claims and [20, 21, 22] answers filed by Algerron Goldsmith, Sr., Terrill McDuffy, Demarlo McCoy, Sherrick Houston, and Andre Lindell. The Court GRANTS the Government's [33, 35, 39, 40, 41] motions for default as they pertain to McDuffy, Goldsmith, McCoy, Houston, and Lindell. The Court further finds as MOOT the [30, 32] motions for hearings by Goldsmith and McDuffy. McDuffy 9;s 31 Motion for Disposition is DENIED. Lastly, the Government's 34 Motion to Dismiss Eight Dogs is GRANTED. The following eight dogs, identified by serial number, are dismissed as defendants: IL-7E-04, IL-1A-05, IL-11D-F3, IL-12A-01, IL-12A-02, IL-12A-03, IL-12A-04, IL-12A-05. (RS1, ilcd)
December 2, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on December 2, 2016. The Court GRANTS the Government's 26 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court finds no just reason for delay, and directs entry of final judgment as to the 27 defaulted defendant dogs and the 14 defaulted potential claimants pursuant to Rule 54(b). Pursuant to 15 U.S.C § 1177 and 7 U.S.C. § 2156(f), the U.S. Marshal Service may dispose of the 27 defaulted defendant dogs according to law, including, if appropriate, transferring all right, title, and interest in any of these 27 dogs to a shelter or other appropriate organization. (RS1, ilcd)
November 10, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on November 10, 2016. The Court GRANTS the Government's Motion for Default, ECF No. 24, pursuant to Rule 55(a). The Government shall file a motion for default judgment within 14 days from the date of this order or risk the case's dismissal for lack of prosecution. (RS1, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately 64 Dogs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gail Linn Noll(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 64 Dogs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sherrick Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jaquan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terrill McDuffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Willie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?