Heavener v. United States of America

Petitioner: Regina Nancy Heavener
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv04175
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 3 JUDGMENT entered on 9/6/2018. (LN, ilcd)
September 5, 2018 Featured Case TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on September 5, 2018. On August 28, 2018, Petitioner filed a #1 motion for relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. On March 6, 2018, this Court sentenced Petitioner to 120 months of imprisonment, 5 years of supervised release, and a $400 special assessment. See [2-1] Judgment at 2-7. On March 20, 2018, Petitioner filed a notice of appeal. ECF No. 115 in Case No. 4:16-cr-40051-SLD-3. At present, Petitioner's direct appeal remains pending in the Seventh Circuit. See Case No. 18-1639. The most recent activity in that appeal is the Seventh Circuit's July 17, 2018 order suspending briefing in the appeal and directing Petitioner to respond to her attorney's Anders brief, in which he requested permission to withdraw from the case because the appeal is frivolous. See ECF No. 131 in Case No. 4:16-cr-40051-SLD-3. "The well established general rule is that, absent extraordinary circumstances, the district court should not consider 2255 motions while a direct appeal is pending." United States v. Robinson, 8 F.3d 398, 405 (7th Cir. 1993). "Whether extraordinary circumstances exist is a question the answer to which depends upon the balancing of the need for speedy relief against the need for conservation of judicial resources." United States v. Davis, 604 F.2d 474, 485 (7th Cir. 1979). This inquiry is left to the district court's discretion. Id. Petitioner has not alleged any extraordinary circumstances that would warrant consideration of her #1 motion while her direct appeal is pending. Accordingly, the #1 motion is DISMISSED without prejudice as premature. See Robinson, 8 F.3d at 405 (modifying the district court's order denying a 2255 motion as untimely because it was filed while the petitioner's direct appeal was pending "from denial to dismissal" of the 2255 motion). This dismissal will not affect Petitioner's ability to file another 2255 motion upon the disposition of her direct appeal because a 2255 motion that is dismissed without a decision on the merits does not count as an initial petition for the purpose of the restrictions on filing a second or successive motion. See O'Connor v. United States, 133 F.3d 548, 550 (7th Cir. 1998). The Clerk is directed to unseal the #1 motion, enter judgment, and close the case. (KML, ilcd)
August 28, 2018 2 Remark: Criminal Superseding Indictment and Judgment see criminal case number 16-40051. (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (ED, ilcd)
August 28, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Regina Nancy Heavener.(ED, ilcd) Modified on 8/28/2018 to seal for content (ED, ilcd). Modified on 9/6/2018 to unseal per 9/5/2018 text order (ED, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavener v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin C Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Regina Nancy Heavener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?