Dodson v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Dodson
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04043
Filed: March 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 05/13/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/5/19. (WG, ilcd)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Samuel Mack Zuidema on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Zuidema, Samuel)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Agreed) by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/18/2019 (Anderson, Kimball)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kimball Richard Anderson on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey W. Dodson. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Levin, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc.. (LN, ilcd)
March 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3049411.), filed by Jeffrey W. Dodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defect Information Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - ODI Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - Interim Owner Notification, #4 Exhibit 4 - Owner Notification, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Notice of Appearance)(Levin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Mack Zuidema
Represented By: Kimball Richard Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Dodson
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?