Powers vs Scott
Petitioner: Thomas Powers
Respondent: Greg Scott
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2019cv04058
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/2/19. Petitioner's Motion for Status of Case #3 is MOOT. Petitioner's case has been transferred to the Northern District of Illinois, where it has been opened as Case No. 19-CV-50069. The clerk is directed to mail Petitioner, along with a copy of this text order, a copy of the text order entered on March 18, 2019, transferring this case to the Northern District. (TC, ilcd)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Status of Case by Petitioner Thomas Powers. Responses due by 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Facility Cover Page) (TC, ilcd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/2/2019) (TC, ilcd).
March 19, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 3:19-cv-50069, filed 03/19/2019. (KM, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Case was electronically submitted to the transferee court. Transferred to the ND/IL. (TC, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/18/19. Petitioner has filed a habeas petition #1 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2254. Based on the petition, Petitioner's case arises out of Winnebago County, Illinois, which is located in the Northern District of Illinois. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2241(d), the clerk is hereby directed to transfer Petitioner's case to the Northern District of Illinois. (TC, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Thomas Powers. Responses due by 4/1/2019. (TC, ilcd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/19/2019 with correct document and emailed to ND/IL) (KM, ilcd).
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Thomas Powers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Scanning Program Cover Sheet) (TC, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers vs Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?