United States of America v. Morehouse

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joel Morehouse
Case Number: 4:2019cv04094
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in U.S. Courthouse, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801 before Chief Judge Sara Darrow, pursuant to the 6/25/2019 Order. (LN, ilcd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(RL, ilcd) (Main Document 5 replaced with correct document on 6/27/2019) (KB, ilcd).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on June 25, 2019. The United States of America's #3 Motion to Amend Petition is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the [3-1] Amended Petition along with its exhibits on the docket. Joel Morehouse is ordered to appear at the United States Courthouse located at 131 East 4th Street in Davenport, Iowa on August 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service ("IRS") summons served upon him on July 26, 2018. An official of the IRS must personally serve a copy of the Order to Show Cause, the Amended Petition, and the exhibits to the Amended Petition on Morehouse within 30 days of entry of this Order. Morehouse may file and serve a written response to the Amended Petition within 14 days of service of the Order to Show Cause, Amended Petition, and exhibits. (AK, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Frooman, Hilary)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on May 10, 2019. Joel Morehouse is ordered to appear at the United States Courthouse located at 131 East 4th Street in Davenport, Iowa on July 2, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service ("IRS") summons served upon him on July 26, 2018. An official of the IRS must personally serve a copy of the Order to Show Cause, Petition, and exhibits to the Petition on Morehouse within 30 days of entry of this Order. Morehouse is ordered to file and serve a written response to the Petition within 14 days of service of the Order, Petition, and exhibits. (AK, ilcd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (LN, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Morehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Morehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Hilary W Frooman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?