Powers v. McCoy et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Defendant: Jane Doe, Eric Kunkel, Ashley McCoy and Aramark Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04135
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to the Clerk of Court from Plaintiff Thomas Powers. (JS, ilcd)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/2/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED:1) Plaintiff's motion for waiver of the partial filing fee or conversion of life reward points ECF #7 is DENIED. Plaintiff must pay the $2.58 filing fee by August 9, 2019 or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. 2) Plaintiff's request for recruitment of pro bono counsel ECF #5 , is DENIED with leave to reassert if he pays the partial filing fee within the allotted time.(SAG, ilcd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Waive Fees by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (JS, ilcd)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Thomas Powers is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $5.16. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $2.58, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. ( Miscellaneous Deadline 8/9/2019) Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/10/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (SAG, ilcd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 1/9/19 through 7/9/19 (SAG, ilcd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (SAG, ilcd) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct date of filing (SAG, ilcd).
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (SAG, ilcd) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct date of filing(SAG, ilcd).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Powers.(SAG, ilcd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/11/2019) (SAG, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?