Bell v. Mitchell
Plaintiff: Timothy Bell
Defendant: Jacquelyn Mitchell
Case Number: 4:2019cv04192
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/5/2019. Plaintiff's motion to correct error #10 is DENIED. Plaintiff asks the Court to correct its Merit Review Order. Specifically, Plaintiff claims that he identified three instances in his complaint where Defendant violated his Constitutional rights, but the Court's Merit Review Order identified only one claim against Defendant. Plaintiff's claim against Defendant is for allegedly violating his Fourteenth Amendment rights. This is the only claim alleged by Plaintiff in his Complaint. Plaintiff has alleged that Defendant violated his Due Process rights on three separate occasions, but those occasions show how the violations allegedly occurred. The only legal claim stated by him is a violation of his Due Process rights as protected by the Fourteenth Amendment. Therefore, no correction to the Court's Merit Review Order is necessary. (KE, ilcd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Correct Court Error in Merit Review and Case Management Order by Plaintiff Timothy Bell. Responses due by 11/18/19. (TC, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Jacquelyn Mitchell on 10/30/2019. (KE, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/30/2019. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/30/2019. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that the plaintiff states a Fourteenth Amendment Due Process claim for deliberate indifference to a serious dental need against Defendant Dr. Mitchell. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to attempt service on the defendant pursuant to the standard procedures. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. See written order. (Rule 16 Deadline 12/30/2019.) (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 10/24/19 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by Plaintiff TIMOTHY BELL. In forma Pauperis review hearing held by telephone. Allegations of the Complaint discussed. Written Order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 10:32 AM.) (TC, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Telephone WRIT issued for Timothy Bell on 10/24/2019 at 10:20 AM for an IFP Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/8/2019. An IFP review hearing is set for 10/24/2019 at 10:20 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this IFP review hearing. (KE, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/8/2019. This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee).Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Timothy Bell is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. (KE, ilcd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Timothy Bell. (KE, ilcd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Timothy Bell.(KE, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacquelyn Mitchell, filed by Timothy Bell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?