Gates v. Hou et al
Plaintiff: Jerry L Gates
Defendant: Grace B Hou, Sharon Coleman, Eric Kunkel, James McCurry, Krista Wilcoxen, Greg Scott and Lynne Shelton
Case Number: 4:2019cv04201
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/4/2019. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff's motions (Docs. 13, 14, 15) are DENIED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (SAG, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 11/26/2019. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff's motion #10 is DENIED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (SAG, ilcd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION in letter form by Plaintiff Jerry L Gates. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (ED, ilcd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Jerry L Gates. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (ED, ilcd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Plaintiff Jerry L Gates. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (ED, ilcd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/18/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. 2. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A. This case is closed. 3. If the plaintiff wishes to appeal this dismissal, he may file a notice of appeal with this court within 30 days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a). A motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis MUST set forth the issues the plaintiff plans to present on appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1)(C). If the plaintiff does choose to appeal, he will be liable for the $505 appellate filing fee irrespective of the outcome of the appeal. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Bias or Prejudice and Motion to Disqualify Judge by Plaintiff Jerry L Gates. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (ED, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 11/12/19 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by Plaintiff Jerry Gates by telephone. Rushville IFP review hearing held by telephone conference. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 1:47 PM.) (TC, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/12/2019 1:47:05 PM ]. File Size [ 1121 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:20 ]. (admin).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 11/7/2019. Plaintiff filed a Motion to Request Counsel #5 . Plaintiff has no constitutional or statutory right to counsel in this case. In considering the Plaintiff's motion, the court asks: (1) has the indigent Plaintiff made a reasonable attempt to obtain counsel or been effectively precluded from doing so; and if so, (2) given the difficulty of the case, does the plaintiff appear competent to litigate it himself? Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). Plaintiff has not shown that he made a reasonable effort to obtain counsel on his own. A plaintiff usually does this by attaching copies of letters sent to attorneys seeking representation and copies of any responses received. Although Plaintiff states he wrote several lawyers, he did not attach any exhibits to his motion. Because Plaintiff has not satisfied the first prong, the Court does not address the second. Plaintiff's motion #5 is DENIED with leave to renew. (SAG, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 TELEPHONE WRIT issued to Rushville TDF for hearing 11/12/19 at 1:50 p.m. (SAG, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/28/2019. An IFP review hearing is set for 11/12/2019 at 1:50 p.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this IFP review hearing.(SAG, ilcd) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct Judge (SAG, ilcd).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Jerry L. Gates is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/11/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (SAG, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 4/10/19 through 10/10/19 (SAG, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jerry L Gates. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jerry L Gates (SAG, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerry L Gates. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerry L Gates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 cover letter)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Hou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace B Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Wilcoxen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?