Neely v. Kraft Heinz, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marvin Neely
Defendant: Kraft Heinz, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04208
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Marvin Neely. Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Fieweger, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Kraft Heinz, Inc.. (Litchfield, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) filed by Defendant Kraft Heinz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Litchfield, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) by Defendant Kraft Heinz, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Litchfield, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John L Litchfield on behalf of Kraft Heinz, Inc. (Litchfield, John) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/20/2019 with Adobe form) (RL, ilcd).
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marvin Neely. Kraft Heinz, Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Fieweger, Stephen)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kraft Heinz, Inc.. (KB, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Kraft Heinz, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3220439.), filed by Marvin Neely. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fieweger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neely v. Kraft Heinz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Neely
Represented By: Stephen T Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz, Inc.
Represented By: John L Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?