West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233 et al
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Donald Clevenger, Caleb Hastings and Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233
Case Number: 4:2020cv04042
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Remark: Notice of Dismissal filed on 3/16/2020 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A). Case terminated. (RL, ilcd)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Syregelas, Peter)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Syregelas, Peter)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Donald Clevenger, Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233, Caleb Hastings, filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Syregelas, Peter)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald Clevenger, Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233, Caleb Hastings. (SKN, ilcd)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/27/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE (Syregelas, Peter)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Donald Clevenger, Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233, Caleb Hastings ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3316922.), filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Syregelas, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Rock Colona IL American Legion Post #1233
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter G Syregelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?