Durasystems Barriers Inc. v. Jeremias, Inc.
Plaintiff: Durasystems, Barriers, Inc
Defendant: Jeremias, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04069
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 1:19-cv-01388-SLD-JEH. (RL, ilcd)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/16/2020 granting the 16 Stipulation to consolidate filed in case 19-1388. The Court additionally on its own motion grants consolidation in case 20-4069. Cases 19-1388 and 20-4069 shall be consolidated with case 19-1388 being the lead case. All future filings shall be filed in case 19-1388 only. Clerk to file the Amended Complaint attached as [16-1] in 19-1388. Due to the filing of the Amended Complaint, Defendant Jeremias, Inc. shall be added to case 19-1388 as a Defendant. (RL, ilcd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Arthur Martin Scheller, III on behalf of Jeremias, Inc. (Scheller, Arthur)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cortney Scott Alexander terminated as counsel in this matter. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/26/20. (WG, ilcd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (re: Cortney S. Alexander) by Plaintiff Durasystems, Barriers, Inc. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Propose Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal)(Platt, Brian)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 AO 120 sent to commissioner. (ED, ilcd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT filed by DURASYSTEMS BARRIERS, INC.(ED, ilcd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05452. .
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer. The Clerk is ORDERED to transfer this case (no: 1:19-cv-05452-TWT) to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division as related to DuraSystems Barriers Inc. v. Van-Packer Co., 1:19-cv-01388-SLD-JEH. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/25/20. (kt) Modified on 3/25/2020 (kt).
March 25, 2020 Remark: Attorney Courtney Scott Alexander is not admitted to practice in the CD/IL and has been notified on admission procedures. (ED, ilcd)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division by Durasystems Barriers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Cortney)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (kt)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Durasystems Barriers Inc.. Jeremias, Inc. waiver mailed on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Alexander, Cortney)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeremias, Inc. (ah)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Durasystems Barriers Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bill Duffy for Durasystems Barriers Inc. (ah)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Durasystems Barriers Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9141720). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,976,768, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 10,024,569, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durasystems Barriers Inc. v. Jeremias, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durasystems, Barriers, Inc
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Represented By: Chad E Nydegger
Represented By: Brian N Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremias, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Martin Scheller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?