Collins v. Berry
Plaintiff: Anthony Collins
Defendant: Ebony Berry
Case Number: 4:2020cv04167
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 09/10/2020, in the amount of $ 76.41; receipt number 34626012237. (SKN, ilcd)
August 6, 2020 Set Deadline: Miscellaneous Deadline 9/8/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 8/4/2020. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Anthony Collins is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $152.82. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $76.41, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE, ilcd)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Anthony Collins. (KE, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Collins. Responses due by 8/14/2020 (KE, ilcd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Collins. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Page)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?