Holt v. Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC
Plaintiff: Dalonzo Holt
Defendant: Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC and Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC doing business as Pro Clean Car Wash
Case Number: 4:2020cv04173
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: The Court adopts the Discovery Plan #12 . Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2022. Proposed pretrial order due by 5/31/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 at 9:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom of the Davenport, Iowa U.S. District Courthouse before Chief District Judge Sara Darrow. Rule 16 conference set 11/6/2020 is VACATED. Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are expected to review Judge Hawleys Standing Order that was revised on 12/6/2018. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure to appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings. Entered: 10/13/2020. (WG, ilcd) Modified on 10/14/2020 (WG, ilcd).
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC. (Richards, Amanda)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/6/2020 at 11:30 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 11/3/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/9/2020. (WG, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC.(Richards, Amanda)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC, filed by Dalonzo Holt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KB, ilcd)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Having reviewed the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #8 and the First Amended Complaint attached thereto, and the Defendant having not filed a response, the Court presumes there is no opposition to the Motion pursuant to CDIL-LR 7.1(B)(2). The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #8 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket the proposed First Amended Complaint [8-1] and the Exhibit [8-2] attached thereto. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/7/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Dalonzo Holt. Responses due by 10/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-2 to First Amended Complaint)(Doak, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Amended Document . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richards, Amanda)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. The Amended Notice of Removal #3 again fails to support the assertion of diversity jurisdiction. See written order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/24/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and Jury Demand by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC.(Richards, Amanda)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC. (Richards, Amanda)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Richards, Amanda) Modified on 8/24/2020 to modify title of filing (ED, ilcd).
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2020. (ED, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/18/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 14th Judicial Circuit Court, Rock Island Co., case number 2020L81 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3449850), filed by Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Richards, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC
Represented By: Amanda M Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Sweep of I&I, LLC doing business as Pro Clean Car Wash
Represented By: Amanda M Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalonzo Holt
Represented By: John F Doak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?