Dearborn National Life Insurance Company v. Hines et al
Plaintiff: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Maurice Hines, Sativa Woods, Kathleen Jenice Woods and Trai Woods
Case Number: 4:2020cv04177
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to Maurice Hines. (KB, ilcd)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company as to Maurice Hines (due to incorrect address). (KB, ilcd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Maurice Hines. Summons returned to counsel for service. (KB, ilcd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Kathleen Jenice Woods waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Mathisen, Eric)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Sativa Woods waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Mathisen, Eric)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Trai Woods waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Mathisen, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Mathisen, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Dearborn National Life Insurance Company (Mathisen, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3450957.), filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Policy Cedrtificate, #2 Exhibit B, Beneficiary Designation, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mathisen, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company v. Hines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sativa Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Jenice Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trai Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?