Sarvestaney v. Higher Learning Commission
Plaintiff: Cyrus Sarvestaney
Defendant: Higher Learning Commission
Case Number: 4:2020cv04203
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to stop (deft #2) Chairman Zinkula from his continued violations of restraining order terms by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 11/18/2020 (KB, ilcd)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 11/10/2020 (RES, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Restraining Order by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (KB, ilcd)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Motion to receive Restraining Order by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 11/2/2020 (RES, ilcd)
October 17, 2020 Filing 6 Exhibits to #5 MOTION to add third defendant by Cyrus Sarvestaney. (KB, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to add third defendant by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5)(KB, ilcd)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to receive restarting court order by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 10/15/2020 (RES, ilcd)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to add second defendant to this case by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 10/15/2020 (RES, ilcd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cyrus Sarvestaney. Responses due by 10/8/2020 (KB, ilcd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Higher Learning Commission, filed by Cyrus Sarvestaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarvestaney v. Higher Learning Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higher Learning Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrus Sarvestaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?