Grayson v. Veryzer et al
Plaintiff: Elle Grayson
Defendant: Elliott R Vermeire, Michael J Reittinger, Sean C Veryzer and Grace A Simpson
Case Number: 4:2020cv04221
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Elle Grayson. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (ED, ilcd)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Grace A Simpson answer due 12/28/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/15/20. (WG, ilcd)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Grace A Simpson. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (McNaught, Karen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Request for Reconsideration Granting Defendants' Motion filed by Plaintiff Elle Grayson. (Grayson, Elle)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Defendants Veryzer and Reittinger's Motion for Extension of Time. Their answer or other responsive pleading is now due by 1/25/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/11/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Defendants Michael J Reittinger, Sean C Veryzer. Responses due by 12/24/2020 (Ewick, Thomas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas R Ewick on behalf of Michael J Reittinger, Sean C Veryzer (Ewick, Thomas)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered. (ED, ilcd)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law by Defendant Elliott R Vermeire. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Sokn, Christopher)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Elliott R Vermeire. (O'Donnell, Philip)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Philip M O'Donnell on behalf of Elliott R Vermeire (O'Donnell, Philip)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elle Grayson. Grace A Simpson served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Grayson, Elle)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elle Grayson. Elliott R Vermeire served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Grayson, Elle)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elle Grayson. Michael J Reittinger served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Grayson, Elle)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elle Grayson. Sean C Veryzer served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Grayson, Elle)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued on 11/2/2020 as to all Defendants. (RES, ilcd)
November 2, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 44626003831 (ANW, ilcd)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Pro Se Plaintiff Grayson's #2 Motion to File Electronically is GRANTED. Court directs the Clerk's Office to issue the Plaintiff log-in credentials for the ECF System. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/29/20. (WG, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION ECF Registration Form - Pro Se by Plaintiff Elle Grayson. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (RES, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Elle Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RES, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson v. Veryzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elle Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott R Vermeire
Represented By: Philip M O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher H Sokn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Reittinger
Represented By: Thomas R Ewick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean C Veryzer
Represented By: Thomas R Ewick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace A Simpson
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?