Zeitler v. Petersen Health Care Management, LLC, d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Plaintiff: Angela Zeitler
Defendant: Peterson Health Care Management, LLC d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center and Petersen Health Care Management, LLC, d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv04231
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angela Zeitler. Petersen Health Care Management, LLC, d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center waiver sent on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Doak, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued and returned to Counsel to effect service. (RES, ilcd)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peterson Health Care Management, LLC d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3519650.), filed by Angela Zeitler. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Doak, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeitler v. Petersen Health Care Management, LLC, d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Zeitler
Represented By: John F Doak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Health Care Management, LLC d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersen Health Care Management, LLC, d/b/a Aledo Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?