Bartels et al v. Talbert et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Bartels, Joshua Bartels and John Bartels
Defendant: Schuyler County, Illinois Department of Natural Resources, John A. Talbert, State of Illinois, Schuyler County Soil & Water Conservation District, Browning Township, Virginia Talbert and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2021cv04012
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 the Talbert Defendants' Motion to Strike. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE Documents #8 and #9 . The Court notes that while the Talbert Defendants' Document #11 is entitled "First MOTION to Strike #9 Notice (Other), #8 Response to Motion, Filed Incorrectly," the document is not a motion but is, rather, yet another copy of their Answer. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/17/2021. (KZ)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Filing Certificate of Service re #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, (Tucker, Edward)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION to Strike #9 Notice (Other), #8 Response to Motion, Filed Incorrectly by Cross Claimants John A. Talbert, Virginia Talbert, Defendants John A. Talbert, Virginia Talbert. Responses due by 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Tucker, Edward)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES , First CROSSCLAIM against United States of America by John A. Talbert, Virginia Talbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conservation Reserve Program Contract, #2 Exhibit Grant of Conservation Right and Easement)(Tucker, Edward)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 3/17/21 TEXT ORDER: NOTICE Filing Answers and Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims to Plaintiff's Complaint re #8 Response to Motion, (Tucker, Edward) Modified on 3/18/2021 to strike (ED).
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 3/17/21 TEXT ORDER: RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Complaint Answers and provides affirmative defenses and cross claims filed by Defendants John A. Talbert, Virginia Talbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conservation Reserve Program Contract, #2 Exhibit Grant of Conservation Right and Easement)(Tucker, Edward) Modified on 3/18/2021 to strike (ED).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants Illinois Department of Natural Resources and Schuyler County Soil & Water Conservation District answer due 4/5/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/8/21. (WG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Illinois Department of Natural Resources, Schuyler County Soil & Water Conservation District. Responses due by 3/19/2021 (Fruth, Shannon)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dfts John A. Talbert and Virginia Talbert answer deadlines are extended 28 days to 4/1/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/5/21. (WG)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Complaint by Defendants John A. Talbert, Virginia Talbert. Responses due by 3/18/2021 (Tucker, Edward)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Edward B Tucker on behalf of John A. Talbert, Virginia Talbert (Tucker, Edward)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/26/21 at 11:00 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 3/23/21. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/24/2021. (WG, ilcd)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by United States of America.(Hoff, David)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Shannon Lynn Fruth on behalf of Illinois Department of Natural Resources, Schuyler County Soil & Water Conservation District (Fruth, Shannon)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial Circuit Court for the State of Illinois, case number 2020CH12 (), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartels et al v. Talbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schuyler County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Natural Resources
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Talbert
Represented By: Edward B Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schuyler County Soil & Water Conservation District
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Talbert
Represented By: Edward B Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David H Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Bartels
Represented By: Dustin Thomas Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bartels
Represented By: Dustin Thomas Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bartels
Represented By: Dustin Thomas Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?