Vibrant Credit Union v. Infinity Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Vibrant Credit Union
Defendant: Infinity Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2021cv04049
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Vibrant Credit Union. Responses due by 5/27/2021 (Pappas, Matthew)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on May 13, 2021. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's unopposed #7 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response is due June 1, 2021. (AAK)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Infinity Federal Credit Union. Responses due by 5/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of law)(Shaff, Martha)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Infinity Federal Credit Union answer due 5/3/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/12/21. (WG)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Infinity Federal Credit Union. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Shaff, Martha)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Martha L Shaff on behalf of Infinity Federal Credit Union (Shaff, Martha)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Maureen St. John on 3/22/21, filed by Vibrant Credit Union. (Pappas, Matthew)
March 18, 2021 Chief Judge Sara Darrow and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added. (JRK)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Infinity Federal Credit Union and emailed back to Pam McCutcheon < to effect service. (ANW) Modified on 3/18/2021 to show where summons was sent(ANW).
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infinity Federal Credit Union (Filing fee $ 402. receipt number 0753-3615337) filed by Vibrant Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Summons)(ANW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vibrant Credit Union v. Infinity Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Martha L Shaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vibrant Credit Union
Represented By: Matthew P Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?