USA v. $43,250.00 in US Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $43,250.00 in US Currency and $25,660.00 in US Currency
Case Number: 4:2021cv04080
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Attorney Douglas J Quivey terminated as counsel in this matter. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/9/21. (WG)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff USA. Responses due by 6/22/2021 (Kim, Richard)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/16/2021 at 10:30 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 7/13/2021. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/7/2021. (WG)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture by $43,250.00 in US Currency.(Mangieri, Paul)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture by $25,660.00 in US Currency.(Mangieri, Paul)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 CLAIM Interest in $25,660.00 U.S. Currency by Defendant $25,660.00 in US Currency. (Mangieri, Paul)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 CLAIM Interest in $43,250.00 U.S. Currency by Defendant $43,250.00 in US Currency. (Mangieri, Paul)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION TO JOHN THIELBERT AND MATEO AGUIRRE (Kim, Richard)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT for Arrest in REM Returned Executed (RES)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 +++ WARRANT/WRIT OF BODY ATTACHMENT issued (sealed). (RES)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 285 form 1, #3 285 form 2, #4 Warrant for Arrest in REM)(RES) (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/3/2021) (RES).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $43,250.00 in US Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $43,250.00 in US Currency
Represented By: Paul L Mangieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,660.00 in US Currency
Represented By: Paul L Mangieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard Kim
Represented By: Douglas J Quivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?