United Storage Association, Inc. v. United Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: United Storage Association, Inc.
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04105
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay Discovery. Status Report due by 8/30/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/28/21. (WG)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant United Fire & Casualty Company. Responses due by 7/9/2021 (Roy, Kingshuk)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by United Fire & Casualty Company.(Roy, Kingshuk)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kingshuk Roy on behalf of United Fire & Casualty Company (Roy, Kingshuk)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rock Island County, case number 2021L61 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3693682), filed by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roy, Kingshuk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Storage Association, Inc. v. United Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Storage Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan T Nessler
Represented By: Timothy Jon Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Kingshuk Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?