Brandt Construction Co. v. City of Moline et al
Plaintiff: Brandt Construction Co.
Defendant: City of Moline, Scott Williams, Matt Timion, Alvaro Macias, Mike Wendt, Sam Moyer, James Patrick Schmidt, Sangeetha Rayapati, Mike Waldron and Pat O'Brien
Case Number: 4:2021cv04111
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (AEM)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/23/2021. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS BCCs Motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Rock Island County, Illinois #8 , and GRANTS IN PART and FINDS MOOT IN PART the parties Joint Motion for Expedited Ruling on Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Remand #13 . The Court declines to award attorneys fees and costs to BCC. The case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Rock Island County. The Clerk is directed to close the case. (AEM)
August 20, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Shadid. Chief Judge Sara Darrow no longer assigned to the case. (ANW)
August 19, 2021 TEXT ONLY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Chief Judge Sara Darrow disqualifies and recuses herself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). This matter is reassigned to Judge Shadid for further proceedings. (AK)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for expedited ruling by Court on Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Brandt Construction Co.. Responses due by 8/20/2021 (Niew, Stanley)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/4/2021 2:29:32 PM ]. File Size [ 5240 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:55 ]. (admin).
August 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via telephone by Attys Stanley Niew and Benjamin Jacobi for Motion Hearing held on 8/4/21. Discussion held regarding Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #9 . The Court GRANTS Motion #9 to the extent a responsive pleading will be due within 14 days of the District Judge's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Rock Island County, Illinois #8 . (Tape #PRC: 2:29 p.m.) (FDS)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendants City of Moline, Alvaro Macias, Sam Moyer, Pat O'Brien, Sangeetha Rayapati, James Patrick Schmidt, Matt Timion, Mike Waldron, Mike Wendt, Scott Williams. (Jacobi, Benjamin)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Setting Motion Hearing in re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2021 at 02:30 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/14/21. (WG)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiff Brandt Construction Co.. (Niew, Stanley)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants City of Moline, Alvaro Macias, Sam Moyer, Pat O'Brien, Sangeetha Rayapati, James Patrick Schmidt, Matt Timion, Mike Waldron, Mike Wendt, Scott Williams. Responses due by 7/27/2021 (Jacobi, Benjamin)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Brandt Construction Co.. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Niew, Stanley)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stanley E Niew on behalf of Brandt Construction Co. (Niew, Stanley)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by City of Moline, Alvaro Macias, Sam Moyer, Pat O'Brien, Sangeetha Rayapati, James Patrick Schmidt, Matt Timion, Mike Waldron, Mike Wendt, Scott Williams re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Moline Code (selected provisions), #2 Exhibit B, Bidding Instructions, #3 Exhibit C, Committee Minutes 2021-05-25, #4 Exhibit D, City Council Agenda 2021-06-08, #5 Exhibit E, Committee Minutes 2021-06-08, #6 Exhibit F, City Council Minutes 2021-06-08, #7 Exhibit G, Kuhlenbeck - Declaration BCC, #8 Exhibit H, Ltr from S.Niew to Council dated 6.10.2021, #9 Exhibit I, Ltr from M.Kostopluos to S.Niew dated 6.11.21, #10 Exhibit Democratic National Committee v Bostelmann, 2020 WL 1320819, #11 Exhibit Johnson v City of Rock Island Ill, 2012 WL 5425605, #12 Exhibit Roller v Board of Educ of Glen Ellyn School Dist No41, 2006 WL 200886, #13 Exhibit Van Dyke v Illinois Department of Children and Family Services, 2014 WL 2134580, #14 Exhibit Yahnke v County of Kane, 2015 WL 1980248)(Jacobi, Benjamin) Modified on 7/6/2021 to clarify title of document(JRK).
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian M Funk on behalf of All Defendants (Funk, Brian)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Karen L McNaught on behalf of All Defendants (McNaught, Karen)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Benjamin Jacobi on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobi, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by City of Moline, Alvaro Macias, Sam Moyer, Pat O'Brien, Sangeetha Rayapati, James Patrick Schmidt, Matt Timion, Mike Waldron, Mike Wendt, Scott Williams. (Jacobi, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Rock Island, Illinois, case number 21 CH 60 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3698845), filed by Mike Wendt, James Patrick Schmidt, Sangeetha Rayapati, Matt Timion, Pat O'Brien, City of Moline, Sam Moyer, Scott Williams, Mike Waldron, Alvaro Macias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2)(Jacobi, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt Construction Co. v. City of Moline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moline
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Williams
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Timion
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro Macias
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Wendt
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Moyer
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Patrick Schmidt
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangeetha Rayapati
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Waldron
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat O'Brien
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandt Construction Co.
Represented By: Stanley E Niew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?