United States of America v. $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 4:2021cv04113
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/11/21. (Hoelzer, John)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nathaniel A Nieman on behalf of $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY (Nieman, Nathaniel)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney John David Hoelzer added for USA and Attorney Richard Kim terminated as counsel in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/11/21. (WG)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Richard Kim to be replaced by John D. Hoelzer, by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 8/24/2021 (Hoelzer, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified by Defendant $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nieman, Nathaniel)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM RETURNED EXECUTED (ANW)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION TO MICHAEL TOVAR (Kim, Richard)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 +++ WARRANT/WRIT OF BODY ATTACHMENT issued (sealed). (ANW)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 arrest warrant, #3 USM 285)(ANW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38,916.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Represented By: Nathaniel A Nieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard Kim
Represented By: John David Hoelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?