Brasmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Korey Brasmer
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv04129
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Korey Brasmer as to US Attorney General (ANW)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 STRICKEN Pursuant to 9/7/2021 Text Order. Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/16/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (ANW) Modified on 9/7/2021 to strike 9/7/2021 Text Order (ANW).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/7/2021 striking document #4 as it was incorrectly filed.(ANW)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of SSA served on 8/5/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (ANW)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/4/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915. The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates that the Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this action. It is ordered that the Clerk issue summons, and the United States Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, summons, and this Text Order upon the Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States.(WG)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Korey Brasmer. Responses due by 8/17/2021 (DePree, Michael)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA, filed by Korey Brasmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(DePree, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brasmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey Brasmer
Represented By: Michael DePree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-ROCK ISLAND SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?