Maher v. 14th Judicial Circuit Court, et al.
Plaintiff: Ryan Keith Maher
Defendant: 14th Judicial Circuit Court, Herb Schultz, Public Defender's Office, IDOC and Vienna Correctional Center
Case Number: 4:2021cv04144
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Request Counsel (filed in letter form) by Plaintiff Ryan Keith Maher. Responses due by 9/29/2021 (SAG)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 9/3/2021. Plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted #2 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.17. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff.(SAG)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (AH)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rock Island Co. Jail Trust Fund Dept. requesting ledgers 2/10/2021 through 8/10/2021 (SAG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00232.
September 1, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to the Central District of Illinois. (kjw)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 8/31/2021. Copy of order mailed by chambers to pro se Plaintiff. (hfh)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Maher. (kjw) Modified on 9/1/2021 to reopen document (SAG).
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ryan Maher. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maher v. 14th Judicial Circuit Court, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Keith Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14th Judicial Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Defender's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vienna Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?