Shunick v. City of Galesburg et al
Plaintiff: Char M Shunick
Defendant: City of Galesburg, Jake Thompson, Patrick Kysler and . Worsfeild
Case Number: 4:2021cv04152
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 10/18/2021, in the amount of $ 202.00; receipt number 14626041777. (AH)
October 7, 2021 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 10/7/2021, in the amount of $ 200.00; receipt number 14626041681 (AEM)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/20/2021. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied #3 . Plaintiff has adequate funds in his account to pay the $402 filing fee. In addition, Plaintiff filed his lawsuit on September 14, 2021. Rather than set aside money for the known filing fee, Plaintiff chose to spend $390 in the commissary in the month prior to filing his complaint. Plaintiff must pay the full $402 fee within 21 days or on or before 10/11/2021. If Plaintiff fails to pay the full fee by this date or fails to explain why he failed to pay the fee, his case will be dismissed without prejudice.(SAG)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/16/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense is denied as moot #5 . The Notice of Case Opening advises Plaintiff the Court must first conduct a merit review of Plaintiff's complaint before considering service of process #2 . (SAG)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Plaintiff Char M Shunick. Responses due by 9/28/2021 (SAG)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Char M Shunick (SAG)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Char M Shunick.(SAG)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Char M Shunick.(SAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shunick v. City of Galesburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Char M Shunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Galesburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Kysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Worsfeild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?