Hill v. Gaunzon et al
Plaintiff: Demeco Hill
Defendant: John Doe, IV, John Doe, III, John Doe, John Doe, V, John Gaunzon, John Doe, II, LaToya Hughes and Melissa Schenkel
Case Number: 4:2024cv04236
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/5/2025. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration #11 is DENIED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (SAG)
February 4, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Judgment by Plaintiff Demeco Hill. Responses due by 2/18/2025. (SB)
January 14, 2025 Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered. (ANW)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MERIT REVIEW ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/13/25.IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED:1. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE because it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and because any attempt by Plaintiff to amend the Complaint would be futile. 28 U.S.C. 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6).2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and against Plaintiff. This case is CLOSED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (ANW)
January 10, 2025 Filing 8 Exhibits re #6 MOTION Injunctive Relief by Demeco Hill. (SB)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $95.93. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 2/3/2025. Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/3/2025. (SAG)
January 2, 2025 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Demeco Hill (SB)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Demeco Hill. Responses due by 1/10/2025. (SB)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/20/2024. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #4 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives that review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (KE)
December 19, 2024 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 1/2/2025. (KE)
December 19, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Demeco Hill. Responses due by 1/2/2025 (KE)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Demeco Hill.(KE)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 1/8/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Demeco Hill.(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Gaunzon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gaunzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaToya Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Schenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demeco Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?