Amer Hardware Mfr v. Reed Elsevier Inc, et al
Plaintiff: American Hardware Manufacturers Association
Defendant: Reed Exhibitions, Reed Elsevier, Inc., Freeman Decorating Services, Inc., Freeman Decorating Company and Association Expositions & Services
Counter_defendant: William P. Farrell, Sr., American Hardware Manufacturers Association and Timothy S Farrell
Third_party_defendant: William P. Farrell, Sr. and Timothy S Farrell
Counter_claimant: Freeman Decorating Services, Inc., Freeman Decorating Company and Reed Elsevier, Inc.
Movant: Christopher Wehking
Case Number: 1:2003cv09421
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 MOTION by Counter Claimant Reed Elsevier, Inc., Defendant Reed Elsevier, Inc. for judgment as a matter of law under Rule 50(a) and for judgment on partial findings under Rule 52(c) (Rothstein, Michael)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 MOTION by Defendant Reed Elsevier, Inc. for judgment as a matter of law under Rule 50(a) and for judgment on partial findings under Rule 52(c) (Rothstein, Michael)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/25/2011: For the reasons stated below, the Court reduces by 5 hours (to 55 hours per side) the amount of time allocated to each side for the trial of this case. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
January 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/16/2011:The Court rules as stated below on the remaining issues in the parties' motions in limine. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/30/2010: The Court grants plaintiff and counterdefendants' motions in limine in part, denies them in part, and defers ruling in part as set forth below. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/29/2010:The Court denies in part, grants in part, and defers ruling in part on defendant's motions in limine as set forthbelow. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/2/2010:(mb, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/23/2010. (ber, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/2/2010. (ber, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/27/2010. (ber, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/26/2010. (ber, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 1/4/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/23/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, signed by the Honorable James B. Moran on 2/10/2009 903 . Mailed notice (ar, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amer Hardware Mfr v. Reed Elsevier Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William P. Farrell, Sr.
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: American Hardware Manufacturers Association
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Timothy S Farrell
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Exhibitions
Represented By: Gino L DiVito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Decorating Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Carballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Decorating Company
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Carballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association Expositions & Services
Represented By: Gino L DiVito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: William P. Farrell, Sr.
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Timothy S Farrell
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Freeman Decorating Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gia Fonte Colunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Freeman Decorating Company
Represented By: Gia Fonte Colunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Reed Elsevier, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hardware Manufacturers Association
Represented By: Angela R. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Christopher Wehking
Represented By: Jon P. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?