CIVIX-DDI LLC v. Hotels.com L.P. et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv06869
Filed: December 6, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 871 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/18/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 6, 2012 835 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/6/2012: The Court denies Hotels.com's Motion in Limine No. 2 in part as moot 755 . The Court directs Civix to supplement its Response 799 to Hotels.com's Motion in Limine No. 2 755 with evidence establishing the basis for Dr. Ophir Frieder's modification opinions on or before December 11, 2012. Civix may respond to that supplement on or before December 14, 2012. Mailed notice (tlm)
November 1, 2012 741 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/1/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 19, 2011 700 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/19/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 19, 2011 668 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/19/2011: The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to strike 655 . [For further details see Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
October 25, 2010 650 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/25/2010: The Court construes the claims as set forth in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order.Mailed notice(kef, )
February 1, 2010 580 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/1/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 5, 2009 531 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff CIVIX-DDI LLC for judgment, MOTION by Plaintiff CIVIX-DDI LLC for judgment on the pleadings of Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Claims (Vickrey, Paul)
October 26, 2009 517 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff CIVIX-DDI LLC for judgment CIVIX'S RENEWED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT AGAINST HOTELS.COM OR ALTERNATIVE RELIEF (DKT. NOS. 363 AND 380) (Sheikh, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIVIX-DDI LLC v. Hotels.com L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?