Acosta v. Target Corporation et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv07068
Filed: December 16, 2005
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Referring Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2014 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 4/18/2014: For the reasons set out in the attached order, the plaintiffs' objections 293 to the defendants' bill of costs 290 , which seeks a total of $8,105.08, are sustained i n part and overruled in part. The defendants may recover $2,896.99 in costs ($8,105.08 minus $5,208.09). All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
June 13, 2012 262 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/13/12: Pending before the court are plaintiffs' three unopposed motions to retain the seal of certain exhibits provisionally filed under seal [216, 230 and 247]. Plaintiffs are given until 6/22/12 to advise the court whether they agree that the 27 exhibits which Target says pertain to undisputed facts may be stricken from the docket as unnecessary. Target is given 14 days thereafter, until 7/6/12, to file an evidentiary supplement showing cause why any exhibits that remain at issue should stay sealed. [For further details see minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 16, 2012 256 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/16/2012: Motion hearing held. Before the court are plaintiffs' three unopposed motions to retain the seal of certain exhibits provisionally filed under seal [216, 230, 247]. For the reasons set forth below, defendants are ordered to show cause why such seal should remain. [For further details see minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 9, 2012 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 3/9/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf, )
July 20, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/20/2010. (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?