American Multi-Cinema, Inc. v. MCL REC, L.L.C.

Case Number: 1:2006cv00063
Filed: January 6, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Referring Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2010 224 Opinion or Order of the Court For the reasons stated below, AMC's objections are sustained in part and overruled in part. The court awards costs to Intercontinental in the amount of $12,738.68. WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/15/2010. (For further detail see written opinion).Mailed notice(smm)
October 12, 2010 215 Opinion or Order of the Court For the reasons stated below, AMCs motion to alter or amend the judgment [198-1] is denied.Mailed notice(jms, )
August 10, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/10/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Multi-Cinema, Inc. v. MCL REC, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?