Young et al v. County of Cook et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00552
Filed: January 30, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 923 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/20/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees and incentive awards [dkt. no. 880]. (mk)
September 15, 2009 478 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/15/2009:(gcy, )
August 11, 2009 415 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Michael Sheahan for judgment Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Gallagher, Daniel)
July 27, 2009 380 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/27/2009:(gcy, )
April 2, 2009 298 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on February 23, 2009 (revised April 2, 2009)(gcy, )
February 23, 2009 278 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/23/2009:(gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. County of Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?