Hicks v. Irvin et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00645
Filed: May 2, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court enters judgment in favor of Defendants Irvin, Savich, Diamond, and Henry and against Plaintiff on Count I and in favor of Defendant Rolke and against Plaintiff on Count II of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/31/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 17, 2012 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/17/2012. MAILED notice(tbk, )
June 7, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/7/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
July 8, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/8/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Irvin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?